Global patent index - EP 1077690 A1

EP 1077690 A1 2001-02-28 - USE OF AMYLOID INHIBITORS FOR MODULATING NEURONAL CELL DEATH

Title (en)

USE OF AMYLOID INHIBITORS FOR MODULATING NEURONAL CELL DEATH

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON AMYLOID-INHIBITOREN ZUR REGULIERUNG DES NEURONALEN ZELLTODES

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS D'AMYLOIDES POUR UNE MODULATION DE MORT DE CELLULES NEURONALES

Publication

EP 1077690 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919499 A

Priority

  • IB 9900968 W
  • US 8557198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959571A1] The invention provides methods of inhibiting A beta -induced neuronal cell death. The invention further provides methods of providing neuroprotection to a subject and methods of treating a disease state characterized by A beta -induced neuronal cell death in a subject. Methods of inhibiting p75 receptor mediated neuronal cell death, as well as methods of treating a disease state in a subject characterized by p75 receptor mediated neuronal cell death are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/185; A61K 31/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 31/185 (2006.01); A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61K 31/661 (2006.01); A61K 31/6615 (2006.01); A61K 31/665 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61K 31/7008 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/185 (2013.01); A61K 31/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959571 A1 19991125; AU 3726299 A 19991206; CA 2333203 A1 19991125; EP 1077690 A1 20010228; IL 139688 D0 20020210; JP 2002515429 A 20020528; MX PA00011213 A 20030422

INPADOC legal status

2010-12-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033427

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2009-12-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20091009

2008-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BELLUS HEALTH (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEUROCHEM (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE