Global patent index - EP 1077738 A2

EP 1077738 A2 2001-02-28 - HIGH PERFORMANCE COIL WIRE

Title (en)

HIGH PERFORMANCE COIL WIRE

Title (de)

HOCHLEISTUNGS-WICKLUNGSDRAHT

Title (fr)

FILAMENT POUR ENROULEMENT HAUTE PERFORMANCE

Publication

EP 1077738 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99924237 A

Priority

  • US 9910673 W
  • US 7894698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958183A2] A high performance coil over-core guide wire. The guide wire incorporates a nickel-titanium core with a stainless steel coil to provide a wire with improved kink resistance and good pushability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/01 (2006.01); A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61M 25/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/09 (2013.01); A61M 2025/09083 (2013.01); A61M 2025/09175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958183A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958183 A2 19991118; WO 9958183 A3 19991229; CA 2331000 A1 19991118; CA 2331000 C 20080115; DE 69936643 D1 20070906; DE 69936643 T2 20080521; DE 69941274 D1 20090924; EP 1077738 A2 20010228; EP 1077738 B1 20070725; EP 1803482 A1 20070704; EP 1803482 B1 20090812; JP 2002514474 A 20020521; JP 2005312987 A 20051110; JP 2007021239 A 20070201; JP 4488961 B2 20100623; US 2002019599 A1 20020214; US 2009149777 A1 20090611; US 6306105 B1 20011023; US 7470239 B1 20081230; US 7946999 B2 20110524; US 7955272 B2 20110607

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED, BM

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140718

2015-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140718

2015-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-07-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER GBR, DE

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110513

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110513

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080428

2007-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69936643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-09-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2007-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040303

2006-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL