Global Patent Index - EP 1077747 A1

EP 1077747 A1 2001-02-28 - METHOD FOR THE MATERIAL DECOMPOSITION OF COMPOSITES CONTAINING ARTIFICIAL RESIN

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE MATERIAL DECOMPOSITION OF COMPOSITES CONTAINING ARTIFICIAL RESIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STOFFLICHEN AUFSCHLUSS VON KUNSTHARZ ENTHALTENDEN VERBUNDWERKSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA DECOMPOSITION MATERIELLE DE MATERIAUX COMPOSITES RENFERMANT UNE RESINE SYNTHETIQUE

Publication

EP 1077747 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941357 A

Priority

EP 9804467 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003764A1] The invention relates to a method for the material decomposition of composites containing artificial resin, characterized in that the high-molecular structure of the artificial resin component is broken down by a chemical reaction with hydroxides of the alkali metals at temperatures above 250 DEG C and possibly partly or fully reprocessed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29B 17/00 (2006.01); A62D 3/32 (2007.01); A62D 3/36 (2007.01); A62D 101/20 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/32 (2013.01); A62D 3/36 (2013.01); A62D 2101/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003764A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003764 A1 20000127; AT 210482 T 20011215; AU 8976798 A 20000207; DE 59802480 D1 20020124; EP 1077747 A1 20010228; EP 1077747 B1 20011212; JP 2002520196 A 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2003-05-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020717

2003-03-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DETLEF FRANK

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-07-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-07-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-07-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802480 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210482 T 20011215

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE