Global patent index - EP 1077767 A1

EP 1077767 A1 2001-02-28 - CONTAMINANT ADSORPTION AND OXIDATION VIA THE FENTON REACTION

Title (en)

CONTAMINANT ADSORPTION AND OXIDATION VIA THE FENTON REACTION

Title (de)

ADSORPTION VON KONTAMINANTEN UND OXIDATION MIT HILFE DER FENTON-REAKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ADSORPTION ET D'OXYDATION DE CONTAMINANTS PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DE LA REACTION DE FENTON

Publication

EP 1077767 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921880 A

Priority

  • US 9910320 W
  • US 8541698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958239A1] Contaminated water is treated by adsorbing contaminant onto a sorbent to concentrate the contaminant and then oxidizing the contaminant via the Fenton and related reactions. Iron is attached to the sorbent or can be added in solution with an oxidant. Both systems, iron attached to the sorbent or iron in solution, can be used to oxidize contaminants on or near the surface of the sorbent. The process can be used to treat contaminated water in above-ground and below-ground treatment systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 21/18; B01J 23/745; C02F 1/28; C02F 1/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/28 (2006.01); C02F 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/722 (2013.01); C02F 1/283 (2013.01); C02F 1/72 (2013.01); C02F 2103/06 (2013.01); C02F 2305/026 (2013.01); Y02W 10/37 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958239 A1 19991118; AU 3898199 A 19991129; CA 2330320 A1 19991118; EP 1077767 A1 20010228; EP 1077767 A4 20010816; JP 2002514498 A 20020521; JP 4751512 B2 20110817

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061125

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021127

2001-08-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01J 21/18 A, 7B 01J 23/745 B, 7C 02F 1/28 B, 7C 02F 1/72 B, 7B 09C 1/00 B

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE