Global Patent Index - EP 1077773 A1

EP 1077773 A1 2001-02-28 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO SPRAY FITTINGS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO SPRAY FITTINGS

Title (de)

SPRÜHKOPF

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTES A OU CONCERNANT DES ACCESSOIRES DE JET

Publication

EP 1077773 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922322 A

Priority

  • GB 9901547 W
  • GB 9810413 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2337471A] A shower handset 1 has a plurality of spray nozzles 28 arranged in concentric arrays 28. The innermost and outermost arrays of nozzles 28a, 28b, and 28c, 28d are permanently open. The intermediate arrays of nozzles 28e, 28f are of increased axial length providing integral valve seats at the inner ends. A valve plate 16 is axially movable in response to rotation of manually operable control member 17 to co-operate with the valve seats to close one or both intermediate arrays of nozzles 28e, 28f to control the water flow through the handset 1. In an alternative arrangement (Figures 6 and 7), each intermediate array of nozzles 28e, 28f has a common valve seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/18; B05B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/16 (2006.01); B05B 1/18 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0291 (2013.01); B05B 1/1609 (2013.01); B05B 1/1645 (2013.01); B05B 1/185 (2013.01); B05B 1/18 (2013.01); B05B 15/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959726A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2337471 A8 20000209; GB 2337471 A 19991124; GB 2337471 B 20020116; GB 9810413 D0 19980715; AU 3942699 A 19991206; EP 1077773 A1 20010228; GB 0029433 D0 20010117; GB 2354191 A 20010321; GB 2354191 B 20020424; IL 139652 A 20040831; IL 139652 D0 20020210; WO 9959726 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037339

2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-11-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021112

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE