Global patent index - EP 1077780 A1

EP 1077780 A1 2001-02-28 - ASSEMBLED EXPANDING LANCE

Title (en)

ASSEMBLED EXPANDING LANCE

Title (de)

GEBAUTE AUFWEITLANZE

Title (fr)

LANCE D'ELARGISSEMENT ASSEMBLEE

Publication

EP 1077780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920838 A

Priority

  • DE 19821807 A
  • EP 9902990 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821807A1] The invention relates to an assembled expanding lance (1) for partially expanding a tubular, linearly running hollow profile by exerting a fluid internal high pressure. The lance contains sealing rings which are each comprised of two components. The first component is formed from a low-abrasive, high pressure resistant elastomer ring (19) which can be elastically deformed by the internal high pressure. The second component is formed by a high pressure resistant support ring (28) which is radially elastic and which, axially, comprises a very high tensile strength. In addition, the elastomer ring comprises a peripheral shoulder (27) which is mounted on the support ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959747A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821807 A1 19991202; DE 19821807 C2 20001019; EP 1077780 A1 20010228; EP 1077780 B1 20030416; ES 2196804 T3 20031216; US 6948709 B1 20050927; WO 9959747 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100503

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100503

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100503

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2196804

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE