Global Patent Index - EP 1077781 A1

EP 1077781 A1 2001-02-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRAWING OFF A METAL STRAND

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRAWING OFF A METAL STRAND

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABZIEHEN EINES METALLSTRANGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EXTRAIRE UNE BARRE METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1077781 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929058 A

Priority

  • DE 9901273 W
  • DE 19823361 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823361A1] The mold walls resting at their bottom end on supports (31) are brought into oscillation starting with their top faces. The length of the oscillation waves is smaller than the length of the mold walls in the direction of billet motion. An Independent claim is given for the apparatus used to implement the process and including oscillation exciters (21) located at least in the top region of the mold (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959749A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823361 A1 19991125; AT 224781 T 20021015; AU 4601299 A 19991206; EP 1077781 A1 20010228; EP 1077781 B1 20020925; ES 2181450 T3 20030216; WO 9959749 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090426

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090426

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080426

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080426

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: OTTO ALEXANDER SCHMIDT

2003-11-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181450 T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902850 20021031

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224781 T 20021015

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL