Global Patent Index - EP 1077794 A1

EP 1077794 A1 2001-02-28 - BRIEFCASE TOOL

Title (en)

BRIEFCASE TOOL

Title (de)

INSTRUMENT DAS IN EINEM DOKUMENTENHALTER EINGEBRACHT WERDEN KANN

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT POUVANT SE RANGER DANS UN PORTE-DOCUMENTS

Publication

EP 1077794 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921924 A

Priority

  • US 9910511 W
  • US 8521398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958303A1] A multiple function combination business travel tool with several business oriented implements in a single compact and reduced configuration for many diverse travel needs. The tool includes a flashlight (16) positioned along a wide handle of the tool so that the bulb and reflector can be larger than with prior art tools. The tool also contains a digital alarm clock (82) and other implements (48, 50, 52, 54, 66, 68) selected with the business traveler in mind. The tool may include scissors (90) deployed by rotating the two handles of the device outwarldy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 11/00; F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 1/00 (2006.01); B26B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 11/008 (2013.01); B25F 1/003 (2013.01); F21L 2/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958303 A1 19991118; WO 9958303 A8 20000210; AU 3901199 A 19991129; CN 1309599 A 20010822; EP 1077794 A1 20010228; EP 1077794 A4 20021009

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-23 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-10-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAGGART, JOHN, MERRICK

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TURNER, JEFFREY, A.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RICHARDSON, EDWARD, S.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NELSEN, DANIEL, J.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANE, STEPHEN, E.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARRISON, MARC

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMITH, DANIEL, P.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PEREIRA, MICHAEL, C.

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI