Global Patent Index - EP 1077859 A2

EP 1077859 A2 2001-02-28 - ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMITTING A TRANSMISSION SIGNAL FROM A TRANSMITTER TO A RAILWAY VEHICLE IN ORDER FOR LOCALIZATION AND TRANSMISSION OF INFORMATION

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMITTING A TRANSMISSION SIGNAL FROM A TRANSMITTER TO A RAILWAY VEHICLE IN ORDER FOR LOCALIZATION AND TRANSMISSION OF INFORMATION

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINES SENDESIGNALS VON EINEM SENDER ZU EINEM SCHIENENFAHRZEUG ZUR ORTUNG UND INFORMATIONSÜBERMITTLUNG

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT POUR TRANSMETTRE UN SIGNAL D'EMISSION D'UN EMETTEUR A UN VEHICULE SUR RAILS POUR LA LOCALISATION ET LA TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS

Publication

EP 1077859 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99932666 A

Priority

  • DE 9901395 W
  • DE 19822114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958388A2] The invention relates to an arrangement for transmitting a transmission signal (S) from a transmitter to a railway vehicle (12) on a section of a track (6) for localization and information transmission purposes. The transmitter (15) is connected to a track conductor (18) arranged in the section of the track (6) and having intersection points. The railway vehicle (12) is provided with a receiver unit (21) that receives the transmission signal (S) and monitors sudden phase changes that occur when the railway vehicle travels over the intersection points (K) of the track conductor (18) in order to localize the railway vehicle. In order to achieve low-interference localization, the invention provides that an occupancy sensor (33) is installed at an entrance point to the track section (6). Said sensor establishes when the railway vehicle enters the track section (6) and emits an occupancy signal (B) indicating that the track section (6) is occupied. The occupancy sensor (33) is also connected to a switching device (36) which is associated with the transmitter (15) and which controls the sensor (15) in such a way that the latter emits a non-modulated transmission signal upon reception of the occupancy signal (B) and then emits a modulated transmission signal after a specific time period has elapsed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/22 (2006.01); B61L 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/225 (2013.01); B61L 25/026 (2013.01); B61L 2003/226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958388A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958388 A2 19991118; WO 9958388 A3 20000302; AT 214671 T 20020415; CN 1151938 C 20040602; CN 1299324 A 20010613; DE 19822114 C1 19991230; EP 1077859 A2 20010228; EP 1077859 B1 20020320; US 6402094 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080505

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070508

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901017

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214671

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI