Global Patent Index - EP 1077860 A1

EP 1077860 A1 2001-02-28 - RAILWAY SWITCH ACTUATOR

Title (en)

RAILWAY SWITCH ACTUATOR

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WEICHEN

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR D'AIGUILLAGE POUR VOIES DE CHEMIN DE FER

Publication

EP 1077860 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918175 A

Priority

  • GB 9901283 W
  • GB 9808900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955571A1] An actuator for a railway rail switch system comprising stock rails (10, 12) and switch rails (16, 18) includes an actuator carriage moveable on a base (20). The carriage is mounted to the switch rails (16, 18) via brackets (72) and is driven relative to the base (20) such that the carriage first moves relative to the brackets to locate a stock rail, and when the stock rail is engaged the brackets move relative to the carriage to align the switch rails to the stock rail. As a result secure clamping is achieved between the switch and stock rails and there is automatic compensation for movement or wear in the rails.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 5/06; B61L 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/06 (2006.01); B61L 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/06 (2013.01); B61L 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955571 A1 19991104; AT 234215 T 20030315; AU 3620499 A 19991116; DE 69905873 D1 20030417; DE 69905873 T2 20040108; EP 1077860 A1 20010228; EP 1077860 B1 20030312; ES 2198911 T3 20040201; GB 2336615 A 19991027; GB 9808900 D0 19980624

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NETWORK RAIL INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20130906

2013-10-09 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130927

2013-10-07 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: NETWORK RAIL INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-10-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130905 AND 20130911

2013-08-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NETWORK RAIL INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CLAVERHAM LTD., CLAVERHAM, GB

- Document: DE 69905873

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-08-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NETWORK RAIL INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CLAVERHAM LTD., CLAVERHAM, BRISTOL, GB

- Document: DE 69905873

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69905873

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WALLACH, KOCH & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69905873

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WALLACH, KOCH, DR. HAIBACH, FEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69905873

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WALLACH, KOCH & PARTNER, DE

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198911 T3

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905873 P 20030417

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE