Global Patent Index - EP 1077890 A1

EP 1077890 A1 2001-02-28 - LIFTING AND TIPPING DEVICE

Title (en)

LIFTING AND TIPPING DEVICE

Title (de)

HUBKIPPVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE ET DE CULBUTAGE

Publication

EP 1077890 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920856 A

Priority

  • EP 9903118 W
  • ZA 9803946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958431A1] The invention relates to a lifting and tipping device for emptying containers into the loading opening of a collecting container, especially for emptying refuse containers (50) into the collecting container (12) of a refuse truck (10). The lifting and tipping device (5) has a swivel drive device (32) in the area of the loading opening (14) to which at least one swivel arm (38) with a device (46) for receiving a container is connected with a non-positive fit. The aim of the invention is to provide a lifting and tipping device (5a, 5b) which is as compact as possible and in which the device (46) for receiving a container moves substantially from the bottom upwards without a significant horizontal component when it takes hold of the refuse container (50). To this end the invention provides for the swivel drive device (32) to be fixed to a slide (60) guided in at least one vertical rail (16), and for means which transform the rotation of the swivel drive device (32), during a simultaneous swivel movement of the swivel arm (38), into a lifting movement of the slide (60) which stops at a defined height of lift. The slide (60) can be locked in relation to the rail (16) at the defined height of lift.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/08; B65F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/00 (2006.01); B65F 3/04 (2006.01); B65F 3/08 (2006.01); B65G 65/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/08 (2013.01); B65F 3/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958431A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958431 A1 19991118; AT 229915 T 20030115; AU 3827899 A 19991129; BR 9910351 A 20011016; CN 1300266 A 20010620; CZ 20003744 A3 20011212; DE 59903838 D1 20030130; DK 1077890 T3 20030414; EP 1077890 A1 20010228; EP 1077890 B1 20021218; ES 2189419 T3 20030701; JP 2002514559 A 20020521; PL 343834 A1 20010910; RU 2195421 C2 20021227; US 6551046 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110923

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2004-10-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030507

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-12-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZOLLER HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189419

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-04-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229915

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZOELLER HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL PT SE