Global Patent Index - EP 1077893 A1

EP 1077893 A1 2001-02-28 - SPOOLING DEVICE WITH A SUPPORT

Title (en)

SPOOLING DEVICE WITH A SUPPORT

Title (de)

AUFSPULVORRICHTUNG MIT STÜTZEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BOBINEUSE MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SOUTIEN

Publication

EP 1077893 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924831 A

Priority

  • DE 19819749 A
  • EP 9902861 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819749A1] A spooling device (1) for continually arriving threads or similar has at least one package holder (3) for receiving several package tubes. Said package holder (3) is fixed at one end, with the package tubes being arranged on the holder or removed from it via the second, free end. The spooling device also has a support (5) which engages with the free end of the at least one package holder which is in an operating position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/553 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/553 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957053A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819749 A1 19991104; CN 1137041 C 20040204; CN 1299332 A 20010613; EP 1077893 A1 20010228; EP 1077893 B1 20020626; ES 2178441 T3 20021216; JP 2002513727 A 20020514; US 6511014 B1 20030128; WO 9957053 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080429

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080429

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080428

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-04-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-11-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178441 T3

2002-11-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ZENTES UNITEX TEXTILE MACHINERY GMBH & CO.KG

2002-10-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901866 20020801

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL