Global patent index - EP 1077924 A1

EP 1077924 A1 2001-02-28 - ETHOXYLATED QUATERNARY ESTER COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

ETHOXYLATED QUATERNARY ESTER COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

ETHOXYLIERTE ESTERQUATS

Title (fr)

COMPOSES QUATERNAIRES D'ESTER ETHOXYLES

Publication

EP 1077924 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920841 A

Priority

  • DE 19821348 A
  • EP 9903000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821348A1] Esterquats (I), (II) and (III) based on hydroxycarboxylic derivatives are new. Ethoxylated esterquats (I), (II) and (III) are new: R<1>CO = 16-22C hydroxyacyl ethoxylated with 1-50 mol ethylene oxide (EO); R<2> and R<3> = H or R<1>CO; R<4> = 1-4C alkyl or (CH2CH2O)qH; R<4>a and R<5> = 1-4C alkyl; X = halide; alkyl sulfate; or alkyl phosphate; m, n and p = 0-12; q = 1-12. Independent claims are also included for: (a) the preparation of compounds (I)-(III); (b) cosmetic preparations containing compounds (I)-(III) and adjuvants and additives from mild co-tensides, oils, emulsifiers, super-fatting agents, washing agents conferring luster, stabilizers, consistency providers, thickeners, polymers, silicone compounds, biogenic active agents, antidandruff agents, film formers, preservatives, hydrotropes, solubilisers, UV filters, antioxidants, insect repellants, self-tanning agents, perfume oils and colorants; (c) clear color reviving agent containing compounds (I)-(III) and nonionic tensides; and (d) clear liquid washing agents containing compounds (I)-(III) and nonionic and/or anionic tensides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 219/06; A61K 7/50; C07C 217/50; C11D 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/45 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); A61Q 17/02 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01); C07C 213/00 (2006.01); C07C 217/08 (2006.01); C07C 217/50 (2006.01); C07C 219/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/45 (2013.01); A61Q 5/006 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); C07C 217/50 (2013.01); C07C 219/06 (2013.01); A61Q 5/02 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61Q 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958492A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821348 A1 19991118; DE 19821348 B4 20060216; EP 1077924 A1 20010228; EP 1077924 B1 20030402; ES 2198132 T3 20040116; JP 2002514618 A 20020521; WO 9958492 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080504

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198132

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904853

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT