Global Patent Index - EP 1077959 A1

EP 1077959 A1 2001-02-28 - MORPHOLINO ETHERS

Title (en)

MORPHOLINO ETHERS

Title (de)

MORPHOLINO-ETHER

Title (fr)

ETHERS DE MORPHOLINE

Publication

EP 1077959 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99950344 A

Priority

  • EP 99950344 A
  • EP 9903139 W
  • EP 98500117 A
  • EP 98500204 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958512A1] A morpholino ether (I), and physiologically acceptable salts and or metabolically labile derivatives thereof, wherein R<1> represents C1-6 straight or branched chain alkyl, C1-6 straight or branched chain alkoxy, optionally substituted phenoxy, C3-6 straight or branched chain alkenyloxy (optionally substituted by 1 or 2 halogen atoms) or C1-4 straight or branched alkoxy substituted by an optionally substituted phenyl group, C3-8 straight or branched chain alkynyl, C3-6 straight or branched chain alkenyl (optionally substituted by C1-4 alkoxy or 1 or 2 halogen atoms), optionally substituted phenyl, optionally substituted C3-7 cycloalkyl, optionally substituted C5-7 cycloalkenyl, C2-4 straight or branched chain alkyl substituted by (C1-4 alkoxy, C1-4 alkyl thio or halogen), C1-4 straight or branched chain alkyl substituted by (C1-4 alkoxycarbonyl, arylalkyloxycarbonyl, aryloxycarbonyl, propadienyl, cyano, optionally substituted C3-7 cycloalkyl, optionally substituted 5 or 6 membered heteroaryl, or 1 or 2 optionally substituted phenyl groups), or methyl substituted by C1-6 alkanoyl or optionally substituted benzoyl; R2 represents a group selected from hydrogen, C1-6 straight or branched chain alkyl, C3-6 straight or branched chain alkenyl, optionally substituted phenyl or C1-4 alkyl substituted with a group selected from C1-4 alkoxy, hydroxy, acyloxy, alkoxy carbonyl or aryloxycarbonyl, and R3 represents a group selected from formyl or cyano; processes for their preparation, their use in medicine and intermediates for their preparation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 265/32; A61K 31/535

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/535 (2006.01); A61K 31/5375 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); C07D 265/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 265/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958512 A1 19991118; AR 016261 A1 20010620; AU 4258899 A 19991129; AU 763088 B2 20030710; BR 9910377 A 20010116; CA 2331584 A1 19991118; CN 1174971 C 20041110; CN 1309651 A 20010822; EP 1077959 A1 20010228; JP 2002514632 A 20020521; MA 26628 A1 20041220; PE 04792000 A1 20000529; TR 200003301 T2 20010221; TW 585858 B 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080514

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERENIUM CORPORATION

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIVERSA CORPORATION

2005-09-07 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001109;LT PAYMENT 20001109;LV PAYMENT 20001109;MK PAYMENT 20001109;RO PAYMENT 20001109;SI PAYMENT 20001109