Global Patent Index - EP 1077965 A1

EP 1077965 A1 2001-02-28 - PHENYL OXO-ACETIC ACIDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA

Title (en)

PHENYL OXO-ACETIC ACIDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA

Title (de)

PHENYL-OXOESSIGSÄUREDERIVATE NÜTZLICH IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON INSULINRESISTENZ UND HYPERGLYCÄMIE

Title (fr)

ACIDES PHENYL-OXO-ACETIQUES UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INSULINORESISTANCE ET DE L'HYPERGLYCEMIE

Publication

EP 1077965 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920419 A

Priority

  • US 9910211 W
  • US 7659698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958519A1] This invention provides compounds of structural Formula (I) wherein A is O, S, or N; B is -(CH2)m-, -CH(OH)-, or carbonyl; R<1> is hydrogen, halogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, alcoxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, or trifluoromethyl; R<2> is alkyl of 1-18 carbon atoms, aryl of 6-10 carbon atoms, arylalkyl of 7-15 carbon atoms, Het-alkyl wherein the alkyl moiety is 1-6 carbon atoms; Het is (a) or (b); R<2a> is alkylene of 1-3 carbon atoms; G is oxygen, sulfur, or nitrogen; R<3>, R<4> are each, independently, hydrogen, halogen, alkyl of 1-3 carbon atoms, aryl of 6-10 carbon atoms or a heterocyclic ring of 5 to 7 ring atom containing 1 to 3 heteroatoms selected from oxygen, nitrogen, sulfur; R<5> is hydrogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, -CH(R<7>)R<8>, -C(CH2)nCO2R<9>, -C(CH3)2CO2R<9>, -CH(R<7>)(CH2)nCO2R<9>, or CH(R<7>)C6H4CO2R<9>; R<6> is hydrogen, halogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, or -OR<5>; m=1-6; n=1-6; R<7> is hydrogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbons atoms, aryl of 6-10 carbon atoms, or arylalkyl of 7-15 carbon atoms; R<8> is -CO2R<10>, -CONHR<10>, tetrazole, or -PO3; R<9> and R<10> are each, independently, hydrogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, aryl of 6-10 carbon atoms, or arylalkyl of 7-15 carbon atoms; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, which are useful in treating metabolic disorders related to insulin resistance or hyperglycemia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 307/80; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/38; C07D 333/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07D 307/80 (2006.01); C07D 333/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 333/56 (2013.01); C07D 307/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958519A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958519 A1 19991118; AU 3791799 A 19991129; CA 2331120 A1 19991118; CN 1308621 A 20010815; EP 1077965 A1 20010228; JP 2002514636 A 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-10-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 4-(BENZOFURAN-3-YLCARBONYL)PHENOXYACETIC ACIDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020208

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001019;LT PAYMENT 20001019;LV PAYMENT 20001019;RO PAYMENT 20001019;SI PAYMENT 20001019