Global Patent Index - EP 1077968 A1

EP 1077968 A1 2001-02-28 - NAPHTHO¬2,3-B HETEROAR-4-YL DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

NAPHTHO¬2,3-B HETEROAR-4-YL DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

NAPHTO¬2,3-B HETEROAR-4-YL-DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE NAPHTO¬2,3-B HETEROAR-4-YLE

Publication

EP 1077968 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920418 A

Priority

  • US 9910210 W
  • US 7644698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958522A1] This invention provides compounds of structural Formula (I), wherein R<1> and R<2> are each, independently, hydrogen, nitrile, nitro, amino, alkylamino of 1-6 carbon atoms, dialkylamino of 1-6 carbon atoms per alkyl group, cycloalkylamino of 3-8 carbon atoms, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, halogen, cycloalkyl of 3-8 carbon atoms, thienyl, furyl, phenyl or phenyl mono-, di-, or tri-substituted with halogen, hydroxy, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, alkoxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, or perfluoroalkoxy of 1-6 carbon atoms; R<3> and R<4> are each, independently, hydrogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, hydroxyalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, aminoalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, acyl of 2-7 carbon atoms; R<5> is hydrogen, halogen, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, nitrile, alkoxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, aryloxy, arylalcoxy of 2-12 carbon atoms, arylsulfanyl; W is S, O, or NR<9>; R<9> is hydrogen or alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms; X is O, -NR<6>-, or -(CH2)pNR<6>-; R<6> is hydrogen, or alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms; p is 1 to 4; Y is methylene, carbonyl, -SO2-, or -SO-; Z is phenyl, heteroaryl, or naphthyl; R<7> and R<8> are each, independently, hydrogen, carboxyl, acyl of 2-7 carbon atoms, hydroxyl, hydroxyalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, hydroxyalkanoyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, alkoxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkoxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, alkoxycarbonyl of 2-7 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkoxycarbonyl of 2-7 carbon atoms, alkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, aryl, aryloxy, aryloxycarbonyl, heteroaryloxycarbonyl, arylalkoxy of 6-12 carbon atoms, heteroaryl, alkanoyloxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, perfluoroalkanoyloxy of 1-6 carbon atoms, heteroaroyloxy, aroyloxy, tetrazolyl, mercapto, nitrile, amino, carbamoy, aminoalkyl of 1-6 carbon atoms, -NHSO2CF3, carboxyaldehyde, halogen, nitro, acylamino, or pyrimidyl optionally substituted with mercapto, 3-hydroxy-cyclobut-3-ene-4-yl-1,2-dione, or tetronic acid; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, which are useful in treating metabolic disorders related to insulin resistance or hyperglycemia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 333/74; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/465; A61K 31/505; C07D 307/92; C07D 409/12; C07D 409/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4436 (2006.01); A61K 31/465 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/60 (2006.01); C07D 307/92 (2006.01); C07D 333/74 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 307/92 (2013.01); C07D 333/74 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958522A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958522 A1 19991118; AR 019842 A1 20020320; AU 3791699 A 19991129; CA 2330555 A1 19991118; CN 1308625 A 20010815; EP 1077968 A1 20010228; JP 2002514639 A 20020521; TW 446704 B 20010721

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: NAPHTHO??2,3-B HETEROAR-4-YL DERIVATIVES

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001106;LT PAYMENT 20001106;LV PAYMENT 20001106;RO PAYMENT 20001106;SI PAYMENT 20001106