Global Patent Index - EP 1077969 A1

EP 1077969 A1 2001-02-28 - BENZOTHIOPHENES, BENZOFURANS, AND INDOLES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA

Title (en)

BENZOTHIOPHENES, BENZOFURANS, AND INDOLES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA

Title (de)

FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON INSULINRESISTENZ UND HYPERGLYCEMIE VERWENDBARE BENZOTHIOPHENE, BENZOFURANE UND INDOLE

Title (fr)

BENZOTHIOPHENES, BENZOFURANES ET INDOLES UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA RESISTANCE INSULINIQUE ET DE L'HYPERGLYCEMIE

Publication

EP 1077969 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921829 A

Priority

  • US 9910209 W
  • US 7671298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961435A1] This invention provides compounds of Formula (I) wherein Ar is (a), (b) or (c). A, B, C, D, E, X, Y, Z<1> and Z<2> are as defined in the description, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, which are useful in treating metabolic disorders related to insulin resistance or hyperglycemia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 333/74; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/38; C07D 209/60; C07D 307/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07D 209/60 (2006.01); C07D 307/92 (2006.01); C07D 333/74 (2006.01); C07D 413/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 307/92 (2013.01); C07D 209/60 (2013.01); C07D 333/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961435A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961435 A1 19991202; AR 015294 A1 20010418; AU 3893999 A 19991213; AU 756337 B2 20030109; BG 104918 A 20010831; BR 9911779 A 20010206; CA 2330620 A1 19991202; CN 1308626 A 20010815; EA 200001175 A1 20010625; EE 200000653 A 20020415; EP 1077969 A1 20010228; HR P20000767 A2 20011031; HU 0101792 A2 20020128; HU 0101792 A3 20030128; ID 26244 A 20001207; IL 139132 D0 20011125; JP 2002516321 A 20020604; NO 20005677 A 20001205; NO 20005677 D0 20001110; PL 344081 A1 20010924; SK 16992000 A3 20010409; TR 200003333 T2 20010221; TW 510900 B 20021121; ZA 200005961 B 20011024

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031381

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-11-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BENZOTHIOPHENES AND BENZOFURANS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001012;LT PAYMENT 20001012;LV PAYMENT 20001012;MK PAYMENT 20001012;RO PAYMENT 20001012;SI PAYMENT 20001012