Global Patent Index - EP 1077971 A1

EP 1077971 A1 2001-02-28 - 1,5-DIARYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLES AS p38 KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

1,5-DIARYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLES AS p38 KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE 1,5-DIARYLPYRAZOLE ALS P38 KINASE INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

PYRAZOLES A SUBSTITUTION 1,5-DIARYLE COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEINE p38 KINASE

Publication

EP 1077971 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921363 A

Priority

  • US 9907036 W
  • US 8549498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958523A1] The present invention contemplates 1,5-diaryl-substituted pyrazole compounds which correspond in structure to Formula (I), or a pharmaceutically-acceptable salt thereof: wherein A is =N- or =CH-; and which inter alia, inhibit the activity of p38 MAP kinase. Also contemplated by the invention are processes for the preparation of the contemplated compounds and for the use of a contemplated compound in treating a mammalian host having a p38 kinase- or TNF-mediated disease.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 401/04; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/505; C07D 401/14; C07D 403/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 33/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958523A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958523 A1 19991118; AU 3859999 A 19991129; CA 2331878 A1 19991118; EP 1077971 A1 20010228; JP 2002514640 A 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081105

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030115

2006-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.D. SEARLE LLC

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE