Global patent index - EP 1077973 A2

EP 1077973 A2 2001-02-28 - BENZOFURAN DERIVATIVES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME, AND A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT

Title (en)

BENZOFURAN DERIVATIVES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME, AND A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT

Title (de)

BENZOFURAN-DERIVATE, DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES AKTIVEN BESTANDTEILS

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE BENZOFURANNE, COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE RENFERMANT CES DERIVES ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DU PRINCIPE ACTIF

Publication

EP 1077973 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99923772 A

Priority

  • HU 9900038 W
  • HU 9801085 A
  • HU 9801086 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958527A2] The invention refers to novel benzofuran derivatives of formula (I), a process for preparing these compounds and to pharmaceutical compositions containing these active substances.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 405/12; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/505; C07D 307/83; C07D 307/86; C07D 405/14; C07D 407/12; C07D 409/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4525 (2006.01); A61K 31/4535 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); C07D 307/79 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 407/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 307/79 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 407/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958527A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958527 A2 19991118; WO 9958527 A3 20000127; AU 4052999 A 19991129; AU 753706 B2 20021024; CA 2332275 A1 19991118; EP 1077973 A2 20010228; HR P20000750 A2 20010630; JP 2002514643 A 20020521; PL 345309 A1 20011203; SK 17212000 A3 20010510

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030924

2001-04-04 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001214;LT PAYMENT 20001214;LV PAYMENT 20001214;MK PAYMENT 20001214;RO PAYMENT 20001214;SI PAYMENT 20001214

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE