Global Patent Index - EP 1077993 A1

EP 1077993 A1 2001-02-28 - GENERATION OF COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES OF COMPOUNDS CORRESPONDING TO VIRTUAL LIBRARIES OF COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

GENERATION OF COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES OF COMPOUNDS CORRESPONDING TO VIRTUAL LIBRARIES OF COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

ERSTELLUNG VON KOMBINATORISCHEN BIBLIOTHEKEN VON VERBINDUNGEN DIE VIRTUELLEN BIBLIOTHEKEN VON VERBINDUNGEN ENTSPRECHEN

Title (fr)

GENERATION DE BIBLIOTHEQUES COMBINATOIRES DE COMPOSES CORRESPONDANT A DES BIBLIOTHEQUES VIRTUELLES DE COMPOSES

Publication

EP 1077993 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922956 A

Priority

  • US 9910383 W
  • US 8509298 P
  • US 7621498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958474A1] The present invention provides methods for the generation of virtual libraries of compounds and using these libraries to build combinatorial libraries. The virtual compounds are generated in silico. The present invention encompasses methods for tracking the addition of fragments, use of reagents, and transformations performed. Further, methods for interfacing the information necessary to generate libraries of compounds with instrumentation that conducts the actual synthesis of the compounds are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/04; C12Q 1/00; G01N 33/566

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/566 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); C40B 30/02 (2006.01); C40B 40/02 (2006.01); C40B 50/00 (2006.01); C40B 50/02 (2006.01); C40B 50/06 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); C40B 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/047 (2013.01); B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); C12N 15/1048 (2013.01); G01N 33/68 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00286 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00308 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00313 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00351 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00585 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0059 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00659 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00689 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00695 (2013.01); B01J 2219/007 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0072 (2013.01); C40B 60/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958474 A1 19991118; WO 9958474 A9 20000203; AU 3983799 A 19991129; EP 1077993 A1 20010228; EP 1077993 A4 20040908; JP 2002514612 A 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050712

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-09-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040722

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE