Global Patent Index - EP 1078084 A1

EP 1078084 A1 2001-02-28 - METHOD OF PRODUCING PLANTS WHICH ARE TOLERANT OR RESISTANT TO HERBICIDES

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING PLANTS WHICH ARE TOLERANT OR RESISTANT TO HERBICIDES

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HERBIZID-RESISTENTEN ODER -TOLERANTEN PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PLANTES TOLERANTES OU RESISTANTES AUX HERBICIDES

Publication

EP 1078084 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915871 A

Priority

  • GB 9901059 W
  • GB 9807818 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953081A1] A method of making plants which are resistant or tolerant to herbicides which, in vitro, inhibit 4-hydroxyphenylpyruvate dioxygenase (4HPPD) comprises the steps of: (i) transforming plant material with a polynucleotide comprising a region encoding a phytoene desaturase; (ii) regenerating the thus transformed material into morphologically normal plants. In a preferred embodiment the region comprised by the polynucleotide is the sequence depicted in SEQ ID No.1, or is a sequence which is complementary to one which when incubated at a temperature of between 55 and 60 DEG C in 0.3 strength citrate buffered saline containing 0.1 % SDS followed by rinsing at the same temperature with 0.3 strength citrate buffered saline containing 0.1 % SDS still hybridises with the sequence depicted in SEQ ID No.1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; A01H 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/53 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0004 (2013.01); C12N 15/8274 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953081 A1 19991021; AU 3429899 A 19991101; BR 9909501 A 20001212; CA 2321965 A1 19991021; CN 1296526 A 20010523; EP 1078084 A1 20010228; GB 9807818 D0 19980610; JP 2002511274 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE