Global patent index - EP 1078099 A1

EP 1078099 A1 2001-02-28 - IDENTIFYING PEPTIDE LIGANDS OF TARGET PROTEINS WITH TARGET COMPLEMENTARY LIBRARY TECHNOLOGY (TCLT)

Title (en)

IDENTIFYING PEPTIDE LIGANDS OF TARGET PROTEINS WITH TARGET COMPLEMENTARY LIBRARY TECHNOLOGY (TCLT)

Title (de)

IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON PEPTIDLIGANDEN VON ZIELPROTEINEN MIT DER "TARGET COMPLEMENTARY LIBRARY" TECHNOLOGIE (TCLT)

Title (fr)

IDENTIFICATION DE LIGANDS PEPTIDIQUES DE PROTEINES CIBLES PAR LA TECHNIQUE DES BANQUES COMPLEMENTAIRES DE CIBLES TCLT

Publication

EP 1078099 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917315 A

Priority

  • US 9906537 W
  • US 8304698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955911A1] Methods and compositions are provided for identifying peptide ligands of target proteins with target complementary libraries. This technology allows the selection of complementary peptides of high binding affinity to the target proteins. Methods and compositions for identifying prophylactic and therapeutic peptides for allergy and the common cold are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/68; A61K 38/02; A61K 39/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/28 (2013.01); C07K 16/00 (2013.01); C07K 16/2821 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/31 (2013.01); C07K 2317/567 (2013.01); C07K 2317/622 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955911 A1 19991104; AU 3546599 A 19991116; AU 762711 B2 20030703; AU 762711 C 20040527; CA 2350163 A1 19991104; EP 1078099 A1 20010228; EP 1078099 A4 20050209

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-11-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1035382

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-02-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20041227

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 A

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/02 B

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001107

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE