Global Patent Index - EP 1078114 A1

EP 1078114 A1 2001-02-28 - COATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING NICKEL AND BORON

Title (en)

COATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING NICKEL AND BORON

Title (de)

NICKEL- UND BORENTHALTENDE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT CONTENANT DU NICKEL ET DU BORE

Publication

EP 1078114 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921772 A

Priority

  • US 9910032 W
  • US 7470398 A
  • US 30684899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958741A1] This invention is directed to plating using a coating bath that provides a hard, wear and corrosion resistant, ductile coating on a substrate, said bath having a pH of about 10 to about 14 and comprising: (1) about 0.175 to about 2.10 moles per gallon of coating bath of nickel ions; (2) an effective amount of lead tungstate to stabilize the bath and to form a continuous coating free from blotches without any substantial deposition of lead tungstate in the coating; (3) an effective amount of metal ion complexing agent in an amount sufficient to inhibit precipitation of said metal ions from the coating bath; and (4) an effective amount of a borohydride reducing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/34; B32B 15/00; C23C 18/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 15/01 (2006.01); B23B 15/00 (2006.01); B32B 15/00 (2006.01); C23C 18/16 (2006.01); C23C 18/34 (2006.01); C23C 18/50 (2006.01); C23C 22/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C23C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/50 (2013.01); C23C 18/1692 (2013.01); C23C 18/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958741 A1 19991118; AU 3889299 A 19991129; AU 757657 B2 20030227; BR 9910239 A 20010109; CN 1220790 C 20050928; CN 1307648 A 20010808; EA 200001163 A1 20010423; EP 1078114 A1 20010228; EP 1078114 A4 20061206; HU 0102519 A2 20011128; HU 0102519 A3 20020930; IL 139149 D0 20011125; JP 2002514686 A 20020521; JP 4467794 B2 20100526; PL 344638 A1 20011119; TR 200003236 T2 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-12-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035005

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070905

2006-12-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061026

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE