Global Patent Index - EP 1078124 A1

EP 1078124 A1 2001-02-28 - IMPREGNATED FOAM MATERIALS

Title (en)

IMPREGNATED FOAM MATERIALS

Title (de)

IMPRÄGNIERTE SCHAUMMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX MOUSSES IMPREGNES

Publication

EP 1078124 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914360 A

Priority

  • AU 9900269 W
  • AU 6077498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953132A1] Polyether-polyurethane foam materials impregnated with bitumen are disclosed. These foam materials find use as sealing strips against moisture, draughts and dust, particularly in the construction of roofs and walls of a building with overlapping formed metal or cement or similar sheets where a strip is inserted in the overlap of two adjacent sheets to provided the required sealing therebetween. The sealing strips can also be used to seal adjacent tiles on a roof between the underside of the tile and its supporting batten or rafter. The bitumen may be a bitumen emulsion, hot bitumen or kerosene-diluted bitumen. The concentration of bitumen in the foam materials can be in excess of 600 kg/m<3>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 7/06; E04B 1/66; E04D 1/36; E04D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/42 (2006.01); E04B 1/68 (2006.01); E04D 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/42 (2013.01); E04B 1/6812 (2013.01); E04D 1/36 (2013.01); C08J 2375/04 (2013.01); C08J 2495/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953132 A1 19991021; AU 705583 B1 19990527; CA 2369796 A1 19991021; EP 1078124 A1 20010228; EP 1078124 A4 20040428; NZ 507799 A 20021025

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1037222

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2008-02-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20070905

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-04-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040316

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001107

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE