Global Patent Index - EP 1078131 A1

EP 1078131 A1 2001-02-28 - ACCESS COVERS FOR MANHOLES

Title (en)

ACCESS COVERS FOR MANHOLES

Title (de)

DECKEL FÜR EINE SCHACHTABDECKUNG

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE D'ACCES POUR TROUS D'HOMME

Publication

EP 1078131 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920950 A

Priority

  • GB 9901231 W
  • GB 9809909 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958770A1] The access cover is of the kind comprising a cover member removably fitted within a generally rectangular outer frame, the cover member being fabricated as a generally rectangular inner frame (13) fixed to a base plate (11), the space formed thereby being subsequently filled with an appropriate filling material. The invention is characterised by a reinforcement arrangement provided for the inner frame (13) comprising a number of bars (8) fixed to the base plate (11) of said inner frame, and each bar comprising sheet material (1) formed into a channel shaped cross section. Conveniently, each bar (8) comprises a bottom web (3) incorporating a line of spaced fixing means (2) for attachment to the base plate (11) and opposed walls (6, 7) which taper outwardly from said web. Preferably, the bars extend parallel to each other and the base plate (11) is provided with respective parallel lines of spaced fixing means (12) for co-operating and interlocking with said fixing means (2) of the bars (8). Preferably, said fixing means (2, 12) comprise a spaced line of co-operating tongues (12) and cut-outs (2) for each bar, the arrangement being such that each bar is interlocked onto the base plate (11) by aligning the co-operating cut-outs and tongues and sliding movement from a side of said base plate. The invention is an improvement to the reinforcement arrangement used hitherto, enabling an extremely strong and rigid cover member to be produced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958770A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958770 A1 19991118; AU 3833499 A 19991129; DE 69901101 D1 20020502; DE 69901101 T2 20020919; EP 1078131 A1 20010228; EP 1078131 B1 20020327; GB 9809909 D0 19980708; HK 1034757 A1 20020712

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070507

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070507

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060508

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901101 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB