Global patent index - EP 1078135 A1

EP 1078135 A1 2001-02-28 - FRONTAGE SYSTEM FOR SIDING A BUILDING

Title (en)

FRONTAGE SYSTEM FOR SIDING A BUILDING

Title (de)

FASSADENSYSTEM FÜR DIE VERKLEIDUNG EINES BAUWERKS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FASADE POUR LE PAREMENT D'UN EDIFICE

Publication

EP 1078135 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99930989 A

Priority

  • DE 9901272 W
  • DE 19822103 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822103A1] The invention relates to a frontage system for siding a building, comprising a support (1) made of metal having a filling element support, wherein filling elements (2, 2'), more particularly, laminated glass panel elements, are placed, said elements being fixed by means of outer locking strips (3) that are releasably connected to the support (1), wherein inner sealing elements (4) and outer sealing elements (5) are also provided. The invention aims at ensuring flexible, simple and functional assembly of said system on any metal support (1). To this end, a separate profile rail (7) is provided on the metal support (1) that is placed thereon for fixing the locking strips (3), the profiles of which have a helical groove section (8) directly interacting with fastening screws (6) and at least one additional locking section (9, 9') located next to the helical groove section (8) and fixing the inner sealing elements (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958781A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822103 A1 19991202; AT 215649 T 20020415; EP 1078135 A1 20010228; EP 1078135 B1 20020403; WO 9958781 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901123

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140426

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901123

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130610

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RP TECHNIK GMBH PROFILSYSTEME

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-10-15 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20080228

2004-12-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: EVG BAUPROFIL SYSTEM ENTWICKLUNGS- UND VERMARKTUNG

- Effective date: 20030103

2004-12-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ESCO METALLBAUSYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-09-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RP TECHNIK GMBH PROFILSYSTEME

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-08-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EVG BAUPROFIL SYSTEM ENTWICKLUNGS- UND VERMARKTUNG

- Effective date: 20030103

2004-08-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ESCO METALLBAUSYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20040622

2003-03-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EVG BAUPROFIL SYSTEM ENTWICKLUNGS- UND VERMARKTUNG

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1078135E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901123

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

2002-04-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 215649

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI