Global Patent Index - EP 1078147 A1

EP 1078147 A1 2001-02-28 - METHOD FOR BORING A TUNNEL IN SOFT GROUND OR ROCK WITH A BORING EQUIPMENT HAVING A BORING HEAD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR BORING A TUNNEL IN SOFT GROUND OR ROCK WITH A BORING EQUIPMENT HAVING A BORING HEAD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VORTREIBEN EINES TUNNELS IN WEICHEM UNTERGRUND ODER IN GESTEIN MITTELS EINER BOHRMASCHINE MIT EINEM BOHRKOPF

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PER AGE D'UNE GALERIE DANS UN SOL MEUBLE OU UNE ROCHE TENDRE A L'AIDE D'UN EQUIPEMENT DOTE D'UNE TETE DE PER AGE

Publication

EP 1078147 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922647 A

Priority

  • NL 9900288 W
  • NL 1009166 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958818A1] A tunnel is bored in soft ground or rock with the aid of boring equipment with a cutting head. In order to prevent collapse or breaking away of earth or rock and subsidence of the boring equipment at the location of high-risk sections of the tunnel, especially in the start or end section and in sections which run just below a traffic way, soft ground or rock is replaced, at least over a section of the length of the tunnel to be bored, by a settable material that sets to produce a solid compact block. The said boring equipment is used to bore through the set compact block in such a way that the tunnel extends at least through part of the cross section of the set compact block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/00 (2006.01); E21D 9/087 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/001 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • "BODENSTABILISIERUNG BEI SCHACHT 7", ANNOUNCEMENT PHILIPP HOLZMANN, XX, XX, 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XX, pages 01 - 05, XP002905061
  • See also references of WO 9958818A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958818 A1 19991118; AU 3959799 A 19991129; DE 69915279 D1 20040408; DE 69915279 T2 20050421; EP 1078147 A1 20010228; EP 1078147 B1 20040303; NL 1009166 C2 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090511

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HOLLANDSCHE *BETON GROEP N.V.

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915279 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL