Global Patent Index - EP 1078157 A1

EP 1078157 A1 2001-02-28 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1078157 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957920 A

Priority

  • DE 9903356 W
  • DE 19911048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911048A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve (1), especially a fuel injection valve for fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines, comprising a piezoelectric or magnetostrictive actuator (13), a valve closing body (3) which can be actuated by the actuator (13) by means of a valve needle (2) and which interacts with a valve seating (5) to form a tight seat. The inventive fuel injection valve also comprises a multiplication device which is arranged between the actuator (13) and the valve needle (2) and which is provided for multiplying an actuator stroke of the actuator (13) into a larger valve needle stroke of the valve needle (2). To this end, the multiplication device comprises at least one lever plate (21) which has at least one radially extending rigid lever segment (26, 27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F16K 31/02 (2006.01); F16K 31/44 (2006.01); H01L 41/09 (2006.01); H01L 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 51/0607 (2013.01); F02M 2200/701 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055492A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911048 A1 20000914; DE 59914675 D1 20080417; EP 1078157 A1 20010228; EP 1078157 B1 20080305; JP 2002539370 A 20021119; US 6494382 B1 20021217; WO 0055492 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914675

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081208

2008-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914675

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE