Global Patent Index - EP 1078205 A1

EP 1078205 A1 2001-02-28 - AIR COOLING ELEMENT, METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME, AND AN AIR COOLING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

AIR COOLING ELEMENT, METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME, AND AN AIR COOLING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

LUFTKÜHLELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZU SEINEM BETRIEB SOWIE LUFTKÜHLANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT A AIR, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE FAIRE FONCTIONNER, ET DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT A AIR

Publication

EP 1078205 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00904781 A

Priority

  • CH 0000104 W
  • CH 38899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052395A1] The aim of the invention is to attain a high level of cooling capacity while avoiding interfering cold air flows. To this end, the invention provides that a chamber (2) is occluded from the room to be cooled by a thin cooling wall (1) made of powder-coated steel with microholes which have a diameter of 0.5 mm, which are arranged in a 5 mm square grid, and whose free cross section is consequently less than 1 %. A pre-chamber (4) which is arranged above the chamber (2) is connected to the same (2) via a dividing wall (3) situated over a distributing socket (17) and has air connections for connecting to an air supply or to an adjacent air cooling element. The cooling air is fed into the chamber (2) via the distributing socket (17) such that it strikes along the inner side of the cooling wall (1) in an intensely turbulent manner. A cooling arrangement comprised of adjacent rows of air cooling elements whose pre-chambers (4) are connected by connecting nipples protrude into connection openings (10) of adjacent cooling elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052395A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052395 A1 20000908; AT 253714 T 20031115; AU 2655500 A 20000921; AU 770154 B2 20040212; CA 2330787 A1 20000908; DE 50004305 D1 20031211; DK 1078205 T3 20040223; EP 1078205 A1 20010228; EP 1078205 B1 20031105; ES 2209816 T3 20040701; JP 2002538408 A 20021112; JP 3663132 B2 20050622; PT 1078205 E 20040227; US 6602129 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-03-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: WIESENSTRASSE 5, 8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH)

2014-03-31 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG ERFINDER

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120225

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 253714 T

- Effective date: 20120225

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080225

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BARCOL-AIR AG

- Free text: BARCOL-AIR AG#GRUNDSTRASSE 16B#8712 STAEFA (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BARCOL-AIR AG#GRUNDSTRASSE 16B#8712 STAEFA (CH)

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080226

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080225

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080226

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070904

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080825

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080225

2008-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-09-05 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080825

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BARCOL-AIR A.G.

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2007-02-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070225

2007-02-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-15 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-10 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209816 T3

2004-04-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031105

2004-03-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400395

2004-02-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004305 P 20031211

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER BRUDERER PATENTANWALT

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI