Global Patent Index - EP 1078212 A1

EP 1078212 A1 2001-02-28 - AIR DISTILLATION PLANT AND CORRESPONDING COLD BOX

Title (en)

AIR DISTILLATION PLANT AND CORRESPONDING COLD BOX

Title (de)

LUFTZERLEGUNGSANLAGE UND DEREN KÜHLBOX

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE DISTILLATION D'AIR ET BOITE FROIDE CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1078212 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915849 A

Priority

  • FR 9900997 W
  • FR 9805532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778234A1] The invention concerns a double column air distillation plant (1), wherein the low pressure column and the medium pressure column are arranged side by side and the low pressure column (3) vessel is above the medium pressure column (2) vessel. The low pressure column is arranged above a cryogenic fluid confining element which may be a mixing column (5), an argon column, a column operating at a pressure level intermediate between the medium pressure and the low pressure, a storage (32) or an exchanger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0489 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04418 (2013.01); F25J 3/04448 (2013.01); F25J 3/04466 (2013.01); F25J 3/04678 (2013.01); F25J 3/04872 (2013.01); F25J 2200/06 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01); F25J 2240/42 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01); Y10S 62/905 (2013.01); Y10S 62/907 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957497A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778234 A1 19991105; FR 2778234 B1 20000602; AU 3428699 A 19991123; AU 745671 B2 20020328; BR 9910080 A 20001226; BR 9910080 B1 20081118; CZ 20004024 A3 20010516; CZ 302387 B6 20110427; DE 69909288 D1 20030807; DE 69909288 T2 20040422; EP 1078212 A1 20010228; EP 1078212 B1 20030702; JP 2002513908 A 20020514; US 6167723 B1 20010102; WO 9957497 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140427

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909288

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140427

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909288

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909288 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB