Global Patent Index - EP 1078217 A1

EP 1078217 A1 2001-02-28 - NON-DESTRUCTIVE ANALYSIS OF A SEMICONDUCTOR USING REFLECTANCE SPECTROMETRY

Title (en)

NON-DESTRUCTIVE ANALYSIS OF A SEMICONDUCTOR USING REFLECTANCE SPECTROMETRY

Title (de)

ZERSTOERUNGSFREIE ANALYSE EINES HALBLEITERS MITTELS REFLEKTIONSSPEKTROMETRIE

Title (fr)

ANALYSE NON-DESTRUCTIVE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR PAR SPECTROMETRIE PAR REFLECTANCE

Publication

EP 1078217 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917648 A

Priority

  • US 9908721 W
  • US 8263998 P
  • US 29424799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954679A1] A method for the determination of parameters of interests of a semiconductor sample is provided. For example, the thickness of an epitaxial or implanted layer, the thickness of a transition layer, and the concentration of free carriers in a substrate layer may be determined without having to destroy the semiconductor sample in the process. In an embodiment, a method starts by measuring an experimental reflectance spectrum of the semiconductor (202). An analytical model of the semiconductor having a film layer, a transition layer and a substrate layer is then constructed (208). Next, optical constants n and k for the film layer, transition layer, and substrate layer are expressed as a function of doping level (210). A profile of the transition layer is determined (211), and if an abrupt profile exists, the transition layer is further modeled as having a plurality of sections, wherein each of the sections is assigned an s-polarization matrix and a p-polarization matrix. An overall modeled reflectance spectrum is then calculated (212) and the parameters therein are varied to achieve a best fit relationship with the experimental reflectance spectrum (214). Thus, the parameter of interest can be determined (216).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01B 11/02; G01N 21/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/06 (2006.01); G01N 21/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/35 (2006.01); H01L 21/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/0641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954679 A1 19991028; AU 3571899 A 19991108; AU 743188 B2 20020117; CA 2328624 A1 19991028; DE 69917899 D1 20040715; DE 69917899 T2 20050825; EP 1078217 A1 20010228; EP 1078217 A4 20010725; EP 1078217 B1 20040609; JP 2002512441 A 20020423; US 6242739 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090420

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090420

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090420

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917899 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-07-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01B 11/02 A, 7G 01N 21/35 B, 7G 01B 11/06 B, 7G 01N 21/21 B

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE