Global Patent Index - EP 1078349 A1

EP 1078349 A1 2001-02-28 - PRESENTATION DEVICE

Title (en)

PRESENTATION DEVICE

Title (de)

PRÄSENTATIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRESENTATION

Publication

EP 1078349 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920444 A

Priority

  • AT 9900115 W
  • AT 31298 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2331894A1] The invention relates to a presentation device (1) comprising a base (5) and bars (3) provided for a flexible stand (2) which can be connected or which connects to the base (5) via a plug connection. The presentation device also comprises a holding device for a poster, a film or other such presentation media (6) for the connection thereof to the base (5) and to the stand (2). T he stand (2) comprises individual bars (3) which can be plugged together or are plugged together, and has at least two cross struts (4) in order to obtain a stand (2) having a double H structure.

[origin: CA2331894A1] The invention relates to a presentation device (1) comprising a base (5) and bars (3) provided for a flexible stand (2) which can be connected or which connects to the base (5) via a plug connection. The presentation device also comprises a holding device for a poster, a film or other such presentation media (6) for the connection thereof to the base (5) and to the stand (2). The stand (2) comprises individual bars (3) which can be plugged together or are plugged together, and has at least two cross struts (4) in order to obtain a stand (2) having a double H structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/13 (2006.01); A47F 7/14 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/13 (2013.01); A47F 7/14 (2013.01); G09F 15/0025 (2013.01); Y10T 403/34 (2013.01); Y10T 403/341 (2013.01); Y10T 403/349 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959122A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908162 U1 19990729; AT 212466 T 20020215; AT 2755 U1 19990325; AU 3802299 A 19991129; AU 752836 B2 20021003; BR 7903354 Y1 20081118; BR 9910407 A 20010109; CA 2331894 A1 19991118; CA 2331894 C 20060124; CN 1141684 C 20040310; CN 1305625 A 20010725; DE 59900774 D1 20020314; EP 1078349 A1 20010228; EP 1078349 B1 20020123; ES 2172327 T3 20020916; GB 0022455 D0 20001101; GB 2350227 A 20001122; GB 2350227 B 20010411; HU 0101702 A2 20010928; HU 0101702 A3 20020729; HU 224238 B1 20050628; JP 2002514794 A 20020521; JP 3954307 B2 20070808; PL 193073 B1 20070131; PL 344252 A1 20011022; PT 1078349 E 20020731; RU 2216788 C2 20031120; TR 200003344 T2 20010521; US 7048239 B1 20060523; WO 9959122 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150512

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140506

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090511

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091111

2010-03-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BS-AUSSTELLUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090508

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091111

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060801

2008-03-19 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060801

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-05-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050511

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EXPO DISPLAY SERVICE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

2002-10-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EXPO DISPLAY SERVICE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172327 T3

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401534

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-04-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900774 20020314

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001127

2002-01-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212466 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001127