Global Patent Index - EP 1078379 A1

EP 1078379 A1 2001-02-28 - EMERGENCY SHUTDOWN SYSTEM

Title (en)

EMERGENCY SHUTDOWN SYSTEM

Title (de)

NOTABSCHALTEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ARRET D'URGENCE

Publication

EP 1078379 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924947 A

Priority

  • DE 19821681 A
  • EP 9903256 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821681A1] The invention relates to an emergency shutdown system, comprising a tubular, stationary guide part (4), an activating knob (6) which is mounted on said guide part in such a way that it can be displaced by means of a connecting link (8); an activating plunger (10) which activates contact elements and which is connected to the activating knob by a carrier (12) in such a way as to be axially displaceable; and a tension spring (14) which acts upon the activating knob (6) and the activating plunger (10). In order to improve the consistency of the release behaviour of the system, the connecting link (8) and the activating plunger (10) have blocking surfaces (16; 18) which face each other. Said blocking surfaces are each stepped at least vertically in relation to the direction of activation (D) of the activating knob (6) with a slope (30; 32). Rigid blocking bodies (36) are mounted adjacently between the blocking surfaces in recesses (34) of the guide part (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/022 (2013.01); H01H 2003/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959175A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821681 A1 19991202; AT 219860 T 20020715; EP 1078379 A1 20010228; EP 1078379 B1 20020626; ES 2178891 T3 20030101; WO 9959175 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100512

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178891 T3

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2002-09-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-09-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901867 20020801

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219860 T 20020715

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE