Global Patent Index - EP 1078380 A1

EP 1078380 A1 2001-02-28 - SELECTOR SWITCH

Title (en)

SELECTOR SWITCH

Title (de)

LASTWÄHLER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR

Publication

EP 1078380 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915703 A

Priority

  • DE 19821775 A
  • EP 9902020 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821775C1] All contact carriers (3) are independently rotatable on a switching shaft (2). Two vacuum switches (27,28) are arranged on the contact carriers such that their actuating pins (35,36) extend in the axial direction. Each contact carrier has two additional rollers (55,56) to force the operation of corresponding contact carriers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 29/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 89/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960588A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821775 C1 19991014; AT 216801 T 20020515; AU 3417899 A 19991206; BG 104589 A 20010131; BG 63835 B1 20030228; BR 9907918 A 20010911; BR 9907918 B1 20130625; CA 2311781 A1 19991125; CN 1134035 C 20040107; CN 1275241 A 20001129; CZ 20004212 A3 20010516; CZ 298858 B6 20080227; DE 59901305 D1 20020529; EP 1078380 A1 20010228; EP 1078380 B1 20020424; HK 1033613 A1 20021025; HU 0100062 A2 20010528; HU 0100062 A3 20010730; HU 223171 B1 20040329; JP 2002516481 A 20020604; JP 3612278 B2 20050119; KR 100420630 B1 20040302; PL 191216 B1 20060331; PL 344005 A1 20010910; RO 118830 B1 20031128; RU 2221301 C2 20040110; UA 70325 C2 20010215; WO 9960588 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140325

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140325

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140325

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070325

2006-03-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901305 20020529

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216801 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-08-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LOAD SELECTOR SWITCH

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE