Global patent index - EP 1078407 A1

EP 1078407 A1 2001-02-28 - BI-CELL SEPARATION FOR IMPROVED SAFETY

Title (en)

BI-CELL SEPARATION FOR IMPROVED SAFETY

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG VON ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN BI-ZELLEN MIT ISOLIERELEMENTEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER SICHERHEIT

Title (fr)

SEPARATION DE BI-ELEMENTS AUX FINS D'UNE MEILLEURE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1078407 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922876 A

Priority

  • US 9910107 W
  • US 7997198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5902697A] Disclosed herein is a safety feature for batteries comprising an integrated series of lithium-ion bi-cells. Each individual bi-cell comprises, sequentially, an anode, a film separator, a cathode, a film separator, and an anode. When multiple bi-cells are joined within a single package an insulator element, preferably an electrolyte permeable insulator element, is placed between anode elements of adjoining bi-cells. This insulator element appears to restrict internal shorting during crushing of the battery, thus avoiding undesirable effects of shorting such as thermal run-away and producing a safer battery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 6/18; H01M 10/04; H01M 10/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 2/14 (2006.01); H01M 2/16 (2006.01); H01M 6/18 (2006.01); H01M 10/04 (2006.01); H01M 10/05 (2010.01); H01M 10/0525 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 10/05 (2013.01); H01M 10/0525 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960639A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5902697 A 19990511; AU 3977399 A 19991206; CA 2331485 A1 19991125; DE 69904932 D1 20030220; DE 69904932 T2 20031224; EP 1078407 A1 20010228; EP 1078407 B1 20030115; ES 2190211 T3 20030716; JP 2002516463 A 20020604; WO 9960639 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1036882

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040507

2005-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-24 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET1

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190211

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030606

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030520

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030520

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69904932

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001009

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT