Global Patent Index - EP 1078417 A1

EP 1078417 A1 2001-02-28 - TRANSPORT PROTECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

TRANSPORT PROTECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

TRANSPORTSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION POUR LE TRANSPORT

Publication

EP 1078417 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921336 A

Priority

  • SE 9900562 W
  • SE 9801203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952174A1] A device for transport protection (1) of a unit for satellite communication, including a protective structure (2), with a transport position and a stand position of the communication unit is distinguished by the protective structure (2) comprising two main portions (3, 4), which in the transport position are assembled with the insides against each other to essentially a box shape, and which in the stand position are connected fixed along each other for forming an enlarged support region. At least one portion (5', 5'') of at least the one main portion (4) is displaceable sideways so as to form a stabilising support portion for acting on a support surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1235 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952174A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952174 A1 19991014; AU 3857599 A 19991025; DE 69923772 D1 20050324; DE 69923772 T2 20051124; EP 1078417 A1 20010228; EP 1078417 B1 20050216; ES 2237101 T3 20050716; SE 511862 C2 19991206; SE 9801203 D0 19980406; SE 9801203 L 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160406

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160406

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160406

2016-11-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69923772

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-05-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-05-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237101 T3

2005-05-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SWE-DISH SATELLITE SYSTEMS AB

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923772 P 20050324

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT