Global Patent Index - EP 1078425 A1

EP 1078425 A1 2001-02-28 - ELECTRIC PLUG-IN CONNECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC PLUG-IN CONNECTOR

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE A FICHES

Publication

EP 1078425 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922154 A

Priority

  • DE 19820901 A
  • EP 9902980 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19820901A1] The connector has at least two round coaxial contacts (12,13) mounted on an electrical component. One contact, preferably the inner one (12), has an adjustment mechanism. A plug (17) with plug contacts for the round contacts can be plugged onto the connector from any direction, e.g. in a plane perpendicular to the longitudinal axis (21) of the round contacts and locked onto the connector, leaving the adjustment mechanism accessible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); H01R 13/20 (2006.01); H01R 24/38 (2011.01); H01R 11/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); H01R 13/20 (2013.01); H01R 24/38 (2013.01); H01R 11/11 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959226A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19820901 A1 19991111; EP 1078425 A1 20010228; EP 1078425 B1 20020220; US 6419530 B1 20020716; WO 9959226 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2003-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900878 20020328

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT