Global Patent Index - EP 1078427 A1

EP 1078427 A1 2001-02-28 - ELECTRICAL PLUG AND SOCKET DEVICE COMPRISING A FIXING UNIT

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL PLUG AND SOCKET DEVICE COMPRISING A FIXING UNIT

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE STECKVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER FIXIEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE ENFICHABLE COMPORTANT UNE UNITE DE BLOCAGE

Publication

EP 1078427 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964426 A

Priority

  • DE 9903957 W
  • DE 29904381 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: RU2231185C2] FIELD: electrical engineering. ^ SUBSTANCE: given electrical plug assembly provides for reliable fixing of plug in closed condition and makes it feasible to check visually from outside placement of plug into closed position. Plug assembly has first plug connector and second plug connector joined to it. First plug connector has check latch which is part of fixing fixture that can be transferred from unblocked to stop position only when both plugs are completely interconnected. Second position of fixing fixture can visually control installation of plug connector to closed position to ensure additional fixing of pug connector in closed position. ^ EFFECT: reliable fixing of plug connector in closed position. ^ 7 cl, 4 dwg

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/641 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6271 (2013.01); H01R 13/641 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054375A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29904381 U1 20000810; AU 3031100 A 20000928; AU 752819 B2 20021003; BR 9910315 A 20010116; EP 1078427 A1 20010228; EP 1078427 B1 20050316; ES 2238866 T3 20050901; HU 0102712 A2 20011228; HU 0102712 A3 20020228; JP 2002539589 A 20021119; JP 4416331 B2 20100217; RU 2231185 C2 20040620; US 6383036 B1 20020507; WO 0054375 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111211

2013-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111210

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111210

2012-10-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59911767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111210

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2238866

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050712

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040226

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE