Global Patent Index - EP 1078462 A1

EP 1078462 A1 2001-02-28 - GLOBAL SIGNAL DISTRIBUTION ARCHITECTURE IN A FIELD PROGRAMMABLE GATE ARRAY

Title (en)

GLOBAL SIGNAL DISTRIBUTION ARCHITECTURE IN A FIELD PROGRAMMABLE GATE ARRAY

Title (de)

ARCHITEKTUR ZUR VERTEILUNG VON GLOBALEN SIGNALENIN EINEM NUTZERPROGRAMMIERBAREN GATTERFELD

Title (fr)

ARCHITECTURE DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN SIGNAL GLOBAL DANS UN RESEAU DE PORTES PROGRAMMABLE PAR L'UTILISATEUR

Publication

EP 1078462 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00913563 A

Priority

  • US 0004477 W
  • US 25506099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049718A1] A global signal distribution architecture for an FPGA architecture that has a plurality of multiplexers (80) with inputs and an output. The outputs of the plurality of multiplexers (80) are coupled to global I/O lines (16) that are coupled to a global signal distribution bus (18) spanning a highest level in the FPGA architecture. A plurality of switch matrices (106) are coupled to global signal distribution bus (18) and to a plurality of utility conductors (108) that are coupled to at least one multiplexer associated with a lowest level in the FPGA architecture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 19/177; H01L 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 19/177 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03K 19/17736 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049718 A1 20000824; WO 0049718 A9 20020627; EP 1078462 A1 20010228; EP 1078462 A4 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE