Global Patent Index - EP 1078465 A4

EP 1078465 A4 2001-05-30 - ZERO DC CURRENT POWER-ON RESET CIRCUIT

Title (en)

ZERO DC CURRENT POWER-ON RESET CIRCUIT

Title (de)

EINSCHALT-RÜCKSETZSCHALTUNG OHNE GLEICHSTROMVERBRAUCH

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE REINITIALISATION A LA MISE SOUS TENSION A CONSOMMATION EN COURANT CONTINU NULLE

Publication

EP 1078465 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99923014 A

Priority

  • US 9910574 W
  • US 8231498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960703A1] The present invention provides a power-on reset circuit (300) that consumes zero DC current including a transistor (P1), capacitor (C), a resistor (R) and an inverter (302).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03L 7/00; H03K 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03K 17/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4994689 A 19910219 - KIKUDA SHIGERU [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 061 (E - 483) 25 February 1987 (1987-02-25)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 119 (E - 116) 3 July 1982 (1982-07-03)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 165 (E - 510) 27 May 1987 (1987-05-27)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 301 (E - 785) 11 July 1989 (1989-07-11)
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 05 31 May 1999 (1999-05-31)
  • See also references of WO 9960703A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960703 A1 19991125; EP 1078465 A1 20010228; EP 1078465 A4 20010530; JP 2002516507 A 20020604; TW 422975 B 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-05-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 03L 7/00 A, 7H 03K 17/22 B

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT