Global Patent Index - EP 1078477 A1

EP 1078477 A1 2001-02-28 - TIME-SWITCHED TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY (TSTD) DEVICE AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

TIME-SWITCHED TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY (TSTD) DEVICE AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZEITSCHALTSENDENDIVERSITÄT UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR IN EINEM MOBILEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF AVEC FONCTION DE DIVERSITE DE TRANSMISSION A COMMUTATION TEMPORELLE (TSTD) ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES

Publication

EP 1078477 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919697 A

Priority

  • KR 9900238 W
  • KR 19980017278 A
  • KR 19980028982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959263A1] There is provided a transmission diversity controlling method in a mobile communication system including a base station which transmits forward common and dedicated channel data through at least two antennas with transmission diversity. The base station sends a message indicating a TSTD (Tune-Switched Transmission Diversity)/non TSTD transmission mode through an antenna to a plurality of mobile stations in the coverage area of the base station. Then, each mobile station analyses the message received from the base station and sets its reception mode to a TSTD/non-TSTD mode according to the transmission mode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/06 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/0604 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959263A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959263 A1 19991118; AU 3735599 A 19991129; AU 752782 B2 20021003; BR 9910317 A 20010925; CA 2331858 A1 19991118; CN 1300479 A 20010620; EP 1078477 A1 20010228; JP 2002515681 A 20020528; KR 19990088235 A 19991227; RU 2199820 C2 20030227

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030210

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK JIN, SOO

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK, SU, WON

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOON, SOON, YOUNG

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHN, JAE, MIN C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD,

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK JIN, SOO

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK, SU, WON

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOON, SOON, YOUNG

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHN, JAE, MIN C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD,

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK JIN, SOO

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARK, SU, WON

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOON, SOON, YOUNG

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHN, JAE, MIN

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE