Global Patent Index - EP 1078551 A1

EP 1078551 A1 2001-02-28 - PANEL LOUDSPEAKER

Title (en)

PANEL LOUDSPEAKER

Title (de)

PLATTENLAUTSPRECHER

Title (fr)

HAUT-PARLEUR A PANNEAUX

Publication

EP 1078551 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924967 A

Priority

  • DE 19821855 A
  • EP 9903312 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821855A1] The loudspeaker includes a core layer and at least one cover layer. A periphery (12) surrounds the loudspeaker with a lateral spacing (A). Connecting members (17) connect the loudspeaker to the periphery. The connecting members are under tension. The connecting members may be formed from the cover layer(s), the layer extending up to the periphery. The periphery may be in the form of a frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/06; H04R 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/06 (2006.01); H04R 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 7/06 (2013.01); H04R 7/18 (2013.01); H04R 2307/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960818A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821855 A1 19991118; EP 1078551 A1 20010228; EP 1078551 B1 20020424; US 7236601 B1 20070626; WO 9960818 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160514

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160514

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901306

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020530

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901306 20020529

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACHMANN, WOLFGANG

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRUMP, GERHARD

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REGL, HANS-JUERGEN

2001-03-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIGANKI, ANDREAS

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE