Global patent index - EP 1078552 A1

EP 1078552 A1 2001-02-28 - DEVICE FOR DYNAMIC EXCITATION OF PANEL LOUDSPEAKERS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DYNAMIC EXCITATION OF PANEL LOUDSPEAKERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN ANREGUNG VON PLATTENLAUTSPRECHERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EXCITER DE MANIERE DYNAMIQUE DES HAUT-PARLEURS A PANNEAUX

Publication

EP 1078552 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926308 A

Priority

  • DE 19821861 A
  • EP 9903309 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821861A1] The device includes a sound panel (11) with a core layer and a cover layer. A holder (22) connects an electromagnetic driver (12) to the sound panel. The holder is connected to the sound panel in at least three places. The holder may comprise an elastic member (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/06; H04R 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/06 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/06 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 9/06 (2013.01); H04R 9/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821861 A1 19991118; EP 1078552 A1 20010228; EP 1078552 B1 20030305; US 6494289 B1 20021217; WO 9960817 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BACHMANN, WOLFGANG

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRUMP, GERHARD

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: REGL, HANS-JUERGEN

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE