Global Patent Index - EP 1078553 A1

EP 1078553 A1 2001-02-28 - SOUND REPRODUCTION DEVICE WORKING ACCORDING TO THE BENDING WAVE PRINCIPLE

Title (en)

SOUND REPRODUCTION DEVICE WORKING ACCORDING TO THE BENDING WAVE PRINCIPLE

Title (de)

SCHALLWIEDERGABEANORDNUNG NACH DEM BIEGEWELLENPRINZIP

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION ACOUSTIQUE FONCTIONNANT SELON LE PRINCIPE DES ONDES DE FLEXION

Publication

EP 1078553 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952146 A

Priority

  • DE 19821862 A
  • EP 9903314 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821862A1] The device includes at least one sound panel (11.1,11.2) which is formed from a core layer and a cover layer. At least one driver (12) is arranged on, or integrated into the sound panel. Two of the sound panels are spaced apart by a distance (A). Elements (13) are provided which connect the two panels. The drivers are arranged on the sides of the sound panel which face each other. At least one driver of one panel may be connected to the driver of the other sound panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/10; H04R 1/40; H04R 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/40 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/10 (2006.01); H04R 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 1/403 (2013.01); H04R 7/10 (2013.01); H04R 9/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960819A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821862 A1 19991118; EP 1078553 A1 20010228; EP 1078553 B1 20030730; US 6622817 B1 20030923; WO 9960819 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160514

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160514

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906440

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040521

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906440 P 20030904

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE