Global Patent Index - EP 1078556 A1

EP 1078556 A1 2001-02-28 - ILLUMINATION LAMP HAVING BRIGHTNESS AND COLOR CONTROL

Title (en)

ILLUMINATION LAMP HAVING BRIGHTNESS AND COLOR CONTROL

Title (de)

LAMPE MIT HELLIGKEITS- UND FARBSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

LAMPE D'ECLAIRAGE A REGULATION DE LA LUMINOSITE ET DE LA COULEUR

Publication

EP 1078556 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99954460 A

Priority

  • KR 9900656 W
  • KR 19990000777 U
  • KR 19990015084 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044205A1] An illumination lamp allows a user to perform brightness and color control in accordance with the state and purpose of use, the environment of use or the tastes of the users. The illumination lamp may include a rectifier (1) for rectifying a current supplied by a power supply; a ballast portion (2) for starting the lamp using the power rectified in the rectifier; a lamp portion (3) that is connected to the ballast portion (2) and that includes more than two tubes (13), each tube (13) having a different color temperature; and a controller (4) that is connected to the ballast portion (2), for controlling a brightness and color of light produced by the illumination lamp.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/36 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/36 (2013.01); H05B 41/3921 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0044205A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044205 A1 20000727; AU 1080200 A 20000807; CN 1293886 A 20010502; DE 69920004 D1 20041014; DE 69920004 T2 20050915; EP 1078556 A1 20010228; EP 1078556 B1 20040908; KR 200164907 Y1 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920004 P 20041014

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE