Global patent index - EP 1078592 A1

EP 1078592 A1 2001-02-28 - Collapsible clothes hanger

Title (en)

Collapsible clothes hanger

Title (de)

Klappbarer Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre pliant pour vêtements

Publication

EP 1078592 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116940 A

Priority

EP 99116940 A

Abstract (en)

The folding coat-hanger has two linked arms (12,13) which swivel on at least one rotational axis. A parting plane (17) between the right and left arms lies outside the plane of symmetry (16) of the arms when splayed out. At least one rotational axis of one arm lies outside the plane of symmetry of the splayed out arms. The arms have a support arm and a middle section (18,19) extending as far as the parting plane. The U-cross-sectioned middle section has elastically deflectable free ends with locking piece.

Abstract (de)

Zusammenklappbarer Kleiderbügel (11) mit zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundenen Schenkeln (12,13), die um zumindest eine Drehachse (32) schwenkbar sind, wobei eine Trennebene (17) des rechten und linken Schenkels (12,13) außerhalb einer Symmetrieebene (16) der Schenkel (12,13) im aufgespreizten Zustand vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/4023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078592 A1 20010228

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030417

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI