Global Patent Index - EP 1078617 A2

EP 1078617 A2 2001-02-28 - Thin sanitary napkin capable of controlled deformation when in use

Title (en)

Thin sanitary napkin capable of controlled deformation when in use

Title (de)

Dünne Damenbinde mit kontrollierter Verformbarkeit während des Gebrauchs

Title (fr)

Serviette hygiénique mince avec déformation controllée pendant l'usage

Publication

EP 1078617 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00117562 A

Priority

  • US 37534399 A
  • US 47724400 A

Abstract (en)

The present sanitary napkin is thin (less than 4 mm in thickness), highly absorbent and has a flexural resistance which provides controlled deformation when in use, namely the assumption of a "W" pattern (good for absorption performance) or a "M" pattern (which enhances comfort). This controlled deformation provides a good comfort potential and simultaneously reduces the likelihood of bunching due to compression forces exerted laterally against the napkin by the thighs of the wearer. The sanitary napkin is characterized by a flexural resistance of not less than about 400g. The sanitary napkin has a cover layer, a barrier layer and an absorbent system having at least one preferential bending zone which allows the napkin to adopt a certain three-dimensional deformation profile in response to lateral compression. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/47218 (2013.01); A61F 13/4704 (2013.01); A61F 13/47227 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15292 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15365 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15373 (2013.01); A61F 2013/455 (2013.01); A61F 2013/4556 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078617 A2 20010228; EP 1078617 A3 20010725; EP 1078617 B1 20071024; AU 5343200 A 20010222; AU 778772 B2 20041223; BR 0004390 A 20010403; BR 0004390 B1 20081118; CA 2316499 A1 20010216; CA 2316499 C 20090217; CN 1143662 C 20040331; CN 1287827 A 20010321; CZ 20002983 A3 20010411; CZ 302200 B6 20101215; DE 60036840 D1 20071206; KR 100699190 B1 20070327; KR 20010021324 A 20010315; MX PA00008000 A 20030619; TW 493981 B 20020711

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034891

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036840 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRISEBOIS, HENRI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CANUEL, LOUIS

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LARIVIERE, CHRISTIANE

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MURJI, ZULFIKAR

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI