Global Patent Index - EP 1078653 A1

EP 1078653 A1 2001-02-28 - Device for inserting an inert gas in a fire extinguishing agent

Title (en)

Device for inserting an inert gas in a fire extinguishing agent

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbringen eines Inertgases in ein Löschmittel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour introduire un gaz inerte dans un agent extincteur de feu

Publication

EP 1078653 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810756 A

Priority

EP 99810756 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a quenching medium supply (13) with a non-return valve (14) and a supply pipe (15) with a dosing valve (16) for the inert gas, which open into a quenching conductor (7) with quenching nozzles (8). The supply pipe opens into a perforated distributor body (11) inside the quenching conductor, which extends along the conductor. At least one hole (12) is arranged in the distributor body between each pair of nozzles.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von flüssigem und/oder gasförmigem Inertgas in ein flüssiges Löschmedium besteht im wesentlichen aus einer mit Löschdüsen (8) versehenen Löschleitung (7), in welche eine mit einem Rückschlagventil (14) versehene Löschmittelzufuhrleitung (13) mündet, und in welche ein mit einem Dosierventil (16) versehenes Zuführrohr (15) für das flüssige und/oder gasförmige Inertgas mündet. Im Innern der Löschleitung (7) geht das Zuführrohr (15) in einen gelochten Verteilkörper (11) über. Zwischen jeweils zwei in Strömungsrichtung des Löschmediums aufeinanderfolgenden Löschdüsen (8) ist in der Löschleitung mindestens ein Loch (12) im Verteilkörper (11) angeordnet. Vorzugsweise ist der Verteilkörper (11) ein biegsamer Schlauch. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 35/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078653 A1 20010228; US 6443233 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070301

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MINIMAX GMBH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MINIMAX GMBH

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MINIMAX GMBH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI