EP 1078693 A1 20010228 - A method and arrangement for fluidizing and/or thermal curing of and/or drying a coating
Title (en)
A method and arrangement for fluidizing and/or thermal curing of and/or drying a coating
Title (de)
Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verteilen und/oder zur thermischen Aushärtung und/oder zum Trocknen einer Beschichtung
Title (fr)
Dipositif et procédé pour étaler et/ou durcir thermiquement et/ou sécher un revêtement
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 99116621 A 19990825
Abstract (en)
A arrangement comprising a device 1 for heating an anti-corrosive coating in a cavity (22) of a vehicle body (2), suitable for directing a medium, being of a temperature required for thermal curing of the coating or drying or fluidizing the coating (22, 23), in the cavity (21). Preferably, guidance elements (3) help to precisely direct the medium (A, B, C) into the cavity (21). <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B05C 7/00 (2006.01); B05C 9/14 (2006.01); B05C 11/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B05C 7/00 (2013.01); B05C 9/14 (2013.01); B05C 11/06 (2013.01); B05B 13/0627 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- WO 9630128 A1 19961003 - EISENMANN KG MASCHBAU [DE], et al
- EP 0003223 A1 19790808 - VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]
Citation (search report)
- [XA] DE 2433310 A1 19760122 - BUECHNER GEORG
- [A] WO 9619296 A1 19960627 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al
- [AD] EP 0003223 A1 19790808 - VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]
- [A] DE 4027634 A1 19920305 - TITTGEMEYER ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]
- [A] US 4101623 A 19780718 - WEBSTER JOHN DAVID, et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 09 31 October 1995 (1995-10-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 261 (C - 0950) 12 June 1992 (1992-06-12)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 233 (C - 304) 19 September 1985 (1985-09-19)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1078693 A1 20010228; AT E270926 T1 20040715; AU 6693400 A 20010319; CZ 2002605 A3 20030115; DE 60012190 D1 20040819; DE 60012190 T2 20050804; EP 1206323 A1 20020522; EP 1206323 B1 20040714; ES 2223565 T3 20050301; PT 1206323 E 20041029; WO 0114071 A1 20010301
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99116621 A 19990825; AT 00954499 T 20000714; AU 6693400 A 20000714; CZ 2002605 A 20000714; DE 60012190 T 20000714; EP 0006719 W 20000714; EP 00954499 A 20000714; ES 00954499 T 20000714; PT 00954499 T 20000714