Global patent index - EP 1078697 A1

EP 1078697 A1 2001-02-28 - Screen bottom for circular screen

Title (en)

Screen bottom for circular screen

Title (de)

Siebeinsatz für eine Rundsiebmaschine

Title (fr)

Fond de tamis pour tamis circulaire

Publication

EP 1078697 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116254 A

Priority

EP 99116254 A

Abstract (en)

The insert has a sieve frame supporting a flat sieve with a parallel spaced deflecting base having a number of deflecting bodies. A support frame holds the deflecting base and the sieve frame. The sieve is divided into a number of sections (1.1-9.1), which are supported by the sieve frame along their edges. The intermediate space between the sieve sections and the deflecting base is separated by walls into several chambers. An Independent claim is included for a cylinder machine incorporating the sieve insert.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Siebeinsatz für eine Rundsiebmaschine, insbesondere für eine Taumelsiebmaschine. Gemäß der Erfindung ist ein solcher Siebeinsatz mit den folgenden Merkmalen ausgestattet: mit einem ebenen Sieb auf das das zu siebende Gut aufgegeben wird; mit einem im wesentlichen parallel und im Abstand hierzu angeordnetem Prallboden, der eine Vielzahl von Prallkörpern trägt; mit einem das Sieb tragenden Siebrahmen; mit einem den Prallboden und den Siebrahmen tragenden Traggerüst; das Sieb ist in eine Reihe von Siebsegmente (1.1-8.1,9.1) unterteilt; der Siebrahmen unterstützt die Siebsegmente entlang deren Konturen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/54; B07B 1/06; B07B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/06 (2006.01); B07B 1/28 (2006.01); B07B 1/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/54 (2013.01); B07B 1/06 (2013.01); B07B 1/288 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078697 A1 20010228; EP 1078697 B1 20031022; DE 59907461 D1 20031127; US 6364118 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-06-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59907461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110818

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALLGAIER WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000323

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI